judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYMOND DEAN BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0127)
Case Number:S-07-0127Case Docketed On:06/11/2007
Linked To: 06-251
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RAYMOND DEAN BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RAYMOND DEAN BROWN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaymond Dean Brown Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 9
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/11/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/23/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/17/2007Brief - Appellant (processed by the prisoner mail system on 9/12/07, per stamp on back of envelope attached and certificate of service)BriefAppellantFinal
10/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - reply briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/22/2007Order - Denying appellant's request for extension to file reply brief.OrderDenyFinal
10/25/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/13/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/14/2007Correspondence - Incoming - change of address from appellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/30/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing appeals, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/20/08 by E. Smith.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal