judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYKRA ASSOCIATES, LLC V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-0929
Short Caption:TYKRA ASSOCIATES, LLC V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2297-09Filed Date:07/22/2010

Opening Event Date:07/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/13/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrka & Associates LLCN
Douglas Tyrka YN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 22, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
08/13/2010RECORD INDEX
08/13/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/12/2010APPENDIX - aplt
11/10/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion for summary reversal - oppo - reply
11/18/2010RECEIVED - corrected copy of certificate of service for the motion for summary affirmance and appendices
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
12/02/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for summary reversal AND reply to oppo to motion for summary affirmance.......
12/10/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY to Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Summary Reversal.
01/24/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTINO FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED. It is *****MORE***
01/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... It is *****MORE*****
01/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RZFIKG) (jl)
02/15/2011MANDATE ISSUED