judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANDS VS. DOW

Case Information: 38137
Short Caption:SANDS VS. DOWCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0004570Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/19/2001 / Cashill, Wm.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Galloway & Jensen--check no. 10165.
07/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11390
07/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Patterson Cashill. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14917
09/07/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-15164
09/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). fn1[The September 4, 2001 order directing appellant to file the docketing statement is vacated.] SNP/CLK 01-16024
09/24/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.