judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARDARIO COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0928
Short Caption:CARDARIO COLEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4165-05Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCordario Coleman Y
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas Heslep, Esquire
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas Heslep, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to July 28, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior COurt, of the record index and record copies in accordanace with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/27/2010RECORD INDEX
08/27/2010RECORD COPIES
08/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/28/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 7, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until December 20, 2010 (no oppo)
11/18/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 20, 2010. (By: JAC)
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 1, 2011 (no oppo)
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Glickman, Steadman
09/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ)
10/24/2011FiledMandate