Case: 07-08-00291-CV
07-08-00291-CV
07/08/2008
Miscellaneous civil
Nicolas Farhood a/k/a Nick Farhood, Individually and d/b/a Cameo Custom Homes
Kevin Clements
No
2nd Court of Appeals
07/09/2008
7th Court of Appeals
07/08/2008
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/10/2008 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
11/21/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
10/16/2008 | Appendix filed | Appellant | |
09/22/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/20/2016 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||||||
04/13/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||||
04/12/2010 | Order entered | | |||||||
02/19/2010 | Petition for review disposed by Supreme Court | DENIED | | ||||||
12/22/2009 | Petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||||
12/14/2009 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
11/10/2009 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | | ||||||
10/19/2009 | Response filed | | |||||||
10/08/2009 | Response requested by the court | | |||||||
10/08/2009 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||||
09/24/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||||
09/15/2009 | Submitted | | |||||||
08/21/2009 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||||
03/19/2009 | Motion to postpone oral argument disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
03/17/2009 | Motion to postpone oral argument filed | | |||||||
03/06/2009 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||||
12/19/2008 | Motion for oral argument disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
12/19/2008 | Submission cancelled | | |||||||
12/10/2008 | Reply brief filed | | |||||||
12/03/2008 | Motion for oral argument filed | | |||||||
11/25/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
11/21/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||||
11/21/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
11/19/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
11/18/2008 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Overruled | | ||||||
11/18/2008 | Response filed | | |||||||
11/12/2008 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |||||||
10/16/2008 | Appendix filed | | |||||||
10/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
10/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
10/06/2008 | Response requested by the court | | |||||||
10/06/2008 | Response filed | | |||||||
09/30/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||||
09/22/2008 | Record checked in | | |||||||
09/22/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
08/22/2008 | Record checked out | | |||||||
08/22/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
08/21/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
07/24/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
07/08/2008 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||||
07/08/2008 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
06/19/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
06/09/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
06/05/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
05/21/2008 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/20/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Farhood, Nicolas | Appellant | Mark H. How Mark Frels |
Clements, Kevin | Appellee | Gary L. Hach |
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court
Denton
Honorable Vicki Barbee Isaacks
2007-60155-393