Case: 14-16-00271-CR
14-16-00271-CR
04/05/2016
Poss With Intent to Deliver a Controlled Substance
Kelli Robinson Fielding aka Kelli Deanne Robinson Fielding
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
09/06/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/2017 | Case stored | | |||||||
06/16/2017 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
06/12/2017 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
05/18/2017 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||||||
05/18/2017 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||||
05/03/2017 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
05/03/2017 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
05/02/2017 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant |
| |||||||
04/18/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||||
01/17/2017 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/01/2016 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
11/04/2016 | State brief due | | |||||||
10/17/2016 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
10/14/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/14/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
10/06/2016 | State brief due | | |||||||
10/05/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
10/05/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
09/06/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
08/18/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
08/18/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/18/2016 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
07/21/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
07/19/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/18/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
07/15/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/15/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
06/16/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
06/16/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
06/15/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
05/17/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
05/16/2016 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
05/16/2016 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
05/16/2016 | Record due | | |||||||
05/09/2016 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/11/2016 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
04/05/2016 | Court reporters information sheet sent |
| |||||||
04/05/2016 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||||
04/05/2016 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
03/21/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
03/16/2016 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/16/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/16/2017 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fielding , Kelli Robinson | Criminal - Appellant | Perry R. Stevens |
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District Attorney | Criminal - State of Texas | Jeri Yenne David P. Bosserman |
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
76437-CR
Ida H. Salinas
35 Yrs. TDCJ