judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAUFER, STEVEN Z. WESTMINSTER BROKERS LIMITED

Case Information: 86-CV-0831
Short Caption:LAUFER, STEVEN Z. WESTMINSTER BROKERS LIMITEDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3468-85Filed Date:05/27/1986

Opening Event Date:05/27/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/10/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/22/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William E. Rollow YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Alvin Friedman NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard J. Medalie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LAUFER, STEVEN Z. WESTMINSTER BROKERS LIMITED
05/27/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/01/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/10/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/22/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/19/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition