judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALTAGRACIA KELLY GRILLO NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTON

Case Information: 86-CV-0882
Short Caption:ALTAGRACIA KELLY GRILLO NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9285-83Filed Date:06/06/1986

Opening Event Date:06/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/27/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/09/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/21/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joseph L. Nellis YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gary I. Rubin NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James F. Jordan NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joseph P. Dyer YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Willard Owens NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Conrad A. Fontaine NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALTAGRACIA KELLY GRILLO ET AL NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTON ET AL
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/06/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RUBING FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DURBIND FOR - APPELLEE NBW ATTY 3 - DYERJ FOR - APPELLEE UMW
01/01/1906 JORDANJ NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTON DYERJ UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA OWENSW UNITED MINE WORKERS FONTAINEC (NATIONAL BANK OF WASHINGTON
06/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/19/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (NAT'L BANK OF WASHINGTON) TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (U.M.W.A.) TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DR/SRT DUE AUGUST 12th PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 081286 SCHPRD DR
09/22/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF & EXHIBITS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1986FiledBriefing Completed
10/27/1986APPELEE'S BRIEF OF (UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (APLE-NAT'L BANK OF WASH) GG PANEL SCDATE 102786 SCHPRD BE
11/10/1986APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIR- MANCE AND APLT'S REPLY BRIEF (APLE'S UNITED MINEWORKERS) PB PANEL SCDATE 111086 SCHPRD OPA
11/18/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF APPELLEE'S UNITED MINE- WORKERS OF AMERICA FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1986APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE (UNITED MINEWORKERS OF AMERICA) MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 092986 SCHPRD R
04/20/1987ORDER DENY MO FOR SUMM AFFIRMANCE & SUMM DISP; CLERK TO SCHD CASE FOR CONS ON JUNE REG CALENDAR. PANELNBST SCDATE 122486 SCHPRD RT
06/09/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/09/1987ARGUED PANELNBMKRG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988LETTER OF APPELLANT PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELPYMKRG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 540 A.2d 743
03/31/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0576
04/21/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD