judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WATSON, DAVID M. AFSCME DISTRICT COUNSEL 20

Case Information: 86-CV-0842
Short Caption:WATSON, DAVID M. AFSCME DISTRICT COUNSEL 20Classification:Appeals - Small Claims - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC16456-85Filed Date:07/26/1985

Opening Event Date:07/26/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/20/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/03/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/15/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid M. Watson NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Lynn H. Johnson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WATSON, DAVID M. AFSCME DISTRICT COUNSEL 20
07/26/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/20/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/03/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/15/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition