judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRADFORD E. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0861
Short Caption:BRADFORD E. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11206-86Filed Date:07/24/1987

Opening Event Date:07/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/05/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBradford E. Williams N
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Schornstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, BRADFORD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/28/88- ORD GRT APLT MO FO NOTE - 01 LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, NOTE - 02 & GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO NOTE - 02 FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT NOTE - 03 THE APLE TO FL IT'S BRF IN 30 NOTE - 03 DAYS.
07/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
09/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD R
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXP RT ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE CT RPTR TO FILE RT BY 8/31/88-ANFX.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD M
07/05/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (205 PGS. -- MITCHELL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD RT
07/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 30, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD: 1-3 PB PANELPY SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD OPE
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/6/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BE
12/05/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(EXHIBITS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED CASE ASAP. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPA
07/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD