judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CECIL EUGENE SWEET v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-232)
Case Number:06-232Case Docketed On:10/12/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CECIL EUGENE SWEET v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CECIL EUGENE SWEET, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCecil Eugene SweetD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/12/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/11/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/17/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavierMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/18/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/18/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal