judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE OSCAR AMAYA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0929
Short Caption:JOSE OSCAR AMAYA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2345-86Filed Date:08/11/1987

Opening Event Date:08/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/31/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose Oscar Amaya N
Samuel G. Mctyre NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Donnie E. Wilson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Patricia L. Petty YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AMAYA, JOSE OSCAR UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/16/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 APRNC OF SAMUEL G. MCTYRE IS NOTE - 02 W/D; APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS OF IDENTITY OF NEW NOTE - 03 COUNSEL OR WILL HE PROCEED PRO NOTE - 04 SE. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 4/28/89 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO FOR NOTE - 05 LV TO FILE BRF AND THE CLK IS NOTE - 06 DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED BRF NOTE - 06 OF APLE. FO THAT THIS APPEAL NOTE - 07 SHALL BE SCHD FOR CONSIDERATN NOTE - 07 AS SN AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS.
01/01/1906 MCTYRES WITHDRAWN 2/16/88.
08/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD DR
01/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (692 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 110687 SCHPRD RT
01/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS & ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO MARCH 14, 1988 TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSEL & TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD X
03/16/1988ORDER APLT IN 20 DAYS TO COMPLY WITH 2/16/88 ORDER OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD ANSA
03/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE PRO SE, TO ORDER 3/16/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD ANSA
03/31/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 3/29/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1988LETTER LTR TO APLT RE: HIS 3/21/88 LTR; SENT FORM 5 & DIRECTED TO COMPLETE & RETURN. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD Q
04/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OF APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD CHECK
04/15/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONNIE E. WILSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988ORDER GRANT F/P MO; APPT DONNIE E. WILSON FOR TO REPRESENT APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD Q
05/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BA
06/21/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD V
11/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD BE
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/17/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/17/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD X
02/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-15-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BE
03/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF THREE BUSINESS DAYS OUT OF TIME GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(7 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 SL PANELRO SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD N
10/31/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/31/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART MOJ AF CONVICTION OF CARNAL KNOWLEDGE/VA CONVICTION OF ENTICING A MINOR CHILD PANELBESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - VAAF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT IN SPANISH RE(?) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD