judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE C. LEGRAND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0924
Short Caption:GEORGE C. LEGRAND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:87-CF-0924Consolidated: 87-CF-1440
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F56650-76Filed Date:07/28/1987

Opening Event Date:07/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/01/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/10/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1990
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge C. Legrand Y
Stuart F. JohnsonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roberto Iraola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEGRAND, GEORGE C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-1440 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 1/23/89 ORD: REMANDING THE NOTE - 02 RECORD TO THE TRIAL JUDGE, WHO NOTE - 03 IS DIRTD TO FORWARD TO THE CT NOTE - 03 W/I 45 DAYS, A MEMO SETTING NOTE - 04 FORTH THE RATIONALE FOR HIS NOTE - 04 DECISION, ANY CREDIBILITY NOTE - 05 FINDINGS UNDERLYING IT, AND NOTE - 05 OTHER PERTINENT MTRS. THE CT NOTE - 06 WILL ADVISE CNSL AS TO ANY NOTE - 06 FURTH PROC TO BE UNDERTAKEN NOTE - 07 AFTER THE TRIAL JUDGE HAS NOTE - 07 SUBMITTED HIS MEMORANDUM.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JOHNSONS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - IRAOLAR FOR - APPELLEE
07/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STUART FISK JOHNSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APLT COUNSEL RE: SUPERIOR COURT PROCEEDING PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD R
01/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (195 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD RT
01/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (74 PGS - JACKSON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1988ORDER 87-924 & 87-1440 CONSOLIDATED; CNSOLIDATED BRF OF APLT DUE BY 3/7/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
03/30/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/5/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 040688 SCHPRD BE
05/02/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/2/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 6/2/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 050388 SCHPRD V
05/10/1988RECEIVED CERTIFIACTION OF 12/16/80 RT FROM CT RPTR MOLLICHELLI - ORD CANCELLED BY USAO. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/01/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 060288 SCHPRD BE
07/08/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 6/12/84 RT FROM CT RPTR SCHERTZER (ORDER CANCELLED BY APLE) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(96 PGS/OLIVER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF EXTRANEOUS MATERIAL INCLUDED IN RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1989RECEIVED RBA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 1/6/89 NOTICE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD CHECK
01/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL RBA & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELROBESC SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD CHECK
01/09/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/10/1989ARGUED PANELRGBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 7 SL PANELROBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO ISSUE ORD TO LOWER CRT; & TO ORDER APLT RELEASED FRM HOSPITAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING TRIAL COURT TO FILE MEMO OR FOR UNCONDITIONAL RELEASE JB PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD OPE
07/13/1989ORDER TRL CRT TO FL MEMO IN RESPONSE TO 1/23/89 ORDER BY 7/14/89. DAS PANELROBESC SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD MEMO
07/17/1989RECEIVED ORDER FROM JUDGE LUKE C. MOORE SUPPLEMENTING THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 7/14/89 MEMO & 7/18/89 AMENDED MEMO TO DIV. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD MEMO
07/21/1989ORDER PARTIES SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS TO FL SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA. DAS PANELROBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (SEE INDEX SHEET) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 8/8/89 SUPP REC TO DIVISION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO 8-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081189 SCHPRD SME
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM TO JULY 14TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 081189 SCHPRD SMA
08/11/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 8/10/89 SUPP MEMO OF APLT TO DIVISION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989RECEIVED APLE SUPP. MEMO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL SUPP MEMO & CLK TO FL SUPP MEMO OF APLE. DAS PANELROBESC SCDATE 081189 SCHPRD VS
08/22/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1989RECEIVED NOTICE OF TYPOGRAPHICAL ERROR IN APLT'S SUPP/MEMO FILED 8/10/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 570 A.2d 786
02/23/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0476
03/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD