judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROOSEVELT HILL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0876
Short Caption:ROOSEVELT HILL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2781-86Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1989
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoosevelt Hill Y
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HILL, ROOSEVELT UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KROLLMANJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
08/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD R
09/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD DSA
09/30/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987LETTER LETTER TO COUNSEL REFERRING APLT'S 11/5/87 LETTER. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE DSA, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD OPE
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1( 699 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG (Original Transcript Transf.-99CO1274)jet PANEL SCDATE 012388 SCHPRD RT
12/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987LETTER LETTER TO APLT RE: STATUS OF APPEAL. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ADDITIONAL 45 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
02/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD N
03/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS TO APRIL 11TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD BA
03/16/1988ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 4/11/88 -NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD V
03/23/1988RECEIVED 2 LETTERS DATED 3/18/88 & 3/19/88, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988LETTER TO APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APPNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
05/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD BA
06/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 8TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD BE
07/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 8, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD BE
08/03/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/8/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 072788 SCHPRD V
08/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BE
08/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
09/27/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 9/24/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988LETTER TO APLT RE STATUS OF APPEAL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT (PRO SE) RE STATUS OF CASE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1988LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS 11/14/88 LTR SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989ARGUED PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/23/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD