judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS YEAGER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0889
Short Caption:DENNIS YEAGER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7516-86Filed Date:07/24/1987

Opening Event Date:07/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis Yeager N
John D. Fauntleroy, Jr.NN
AppellantDennis Yeager N
Monoranjan Bezboruah YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Leslie A. Blackmon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YEAGER, DENNIS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072889 ORD: SS, VACATE THE NOTE - 01 6/29/89 ORDER; APLT TO TAKE NOTE - 02 NEC STEPS TO OBTAIN COMPLETED NOTE - 02 RT IN C.R. DIV & FL APLT BRF NOTE - 03 IN 14 DAYS OF CRT-APTD COUNSEL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT SHALL BE REFERRED TO NOTE - 04 THE BPR FOR WHATEVER DISP IT NOTE - 04 MAY DEEM APPROPRIATE. NOTE - 05 8/29/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 06 OF JOHN FAUNTLEROY & APPT NOTE - 06 MONORANJAN BEZBORUAH FOR APLT; NOTE - 07 JOHN FAUNTLEROY TO TRANSMIT TO NOTE - 07 NEW COUNSEL THE REC & ALL NOTE - 08 PAPERS NECESSARY FOR CASE; BRF NOTE - 08 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 FAUNTLEROYJ VACATED 8/29/89.
07/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN D. FAUNTLEROY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD DSA
10/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DSA
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(17 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(200 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
06/29/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE BA W/IN 20 DAYS OR APPEAL MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELRO SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BA
08/16/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MONORANJAN BEZBORUAH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD GG
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-9-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/8/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 8, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INC. 12/8/89. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 27, 1989 AJ PANEL SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER DIRG CLK TO FILE APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; FO APLE'S BR TO BE FLD W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 12, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(INDICTMENT) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 3/12/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/28/1990SUBMITTED PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/21/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD