judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THADDEUS LOWE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0888
Short Caption:THADDEUS LOWE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7504-86Filed Date:07/28/1987

Opening Event Date:07/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/05/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThaddeus Lowe N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOWE, THADDEUS UNITED STATES
07/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD DSA
09/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD R
11/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (272 PGS - VAN BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 101087 SCHPRD RT
11/23/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 2ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1ST (NO OPPO) JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 9, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD N
03/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/10/88- NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD V
05/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/14/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BE
05/24/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BRF DUE IN 10 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD V
06/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060388 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/30/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD