judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROMONE L. GABRIEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0916
Short Caption:ROMONE L. GABRIEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12715-86Filed Date:08/03/1987

Opening Event Date:08/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/18/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/14/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRomone L. Gabriel N
Robert J. Dowlut YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert C. Little YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GABRIEL, ROMONE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM MCFADDEN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 BRIEF IN 87-778 MLH NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 7/7/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 03 FOR LV TO FL OPPO TO MO OF NOTE - 04 APLT FOR SUMM REV & CLK TO FL NOTE - 04 OPPO; DENY MO OF APLT FOR SUMM NOTE - 05 REV; GRANT MO OF APLE TO CONS NOTE - 05 87-778 & 87-916; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 06 IN 87-778 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 08 7/28/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 08 IN 87-778 TO CONS 88-440 W/87- NOTE - 09 778 & 87-916; BA IN 88-440 DUE NOTE - 09 BY 8/8/88; BA IN 87-778 DUE BY NOTE - 10 8/17/88; CONS BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 10 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 11 092088 ORDER: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 11 TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS NOTE - 12 PENDING DISPOSITION OF APLT MO NOTE - 12 FILED IN THE TR CT PER D.C. NOTE - 13 CODE 23-110; FO; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 13 APLT MCFADDEN W/IN 10 DAYS TO NOTE - 14 FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF THE NOTE - 14 23-110 MO W/A COPY OF THE MO. NOTE - 15 10/23/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 15 FOR RECONSID TO EXTENT THAT NOTE - 16 87-916 IS SEVERED FROM 87-778 NOTE - 16 AND 88-440; BRF OF APLE IN NOTE - 17 THIS CASE DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 17
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DOWLUTR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ACKERE FOR - APPELLEE
08/03/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
09/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 100287 SCHPRD R
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (220 PGS - RUST) PB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD RT
01/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (264 PGS. -- GLEASON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD RT
01/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988RECORD COMPLETED
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF LIST & APPENDIX RJG PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 87-778 & TO FILE APPEL- LEE'S BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER FILING OF APPELLANT'S (NOTE 2) PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BE
04/29/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD OPE
07/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD OPA
07/07/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-10. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-778 TO 40 DAYS AFTER RESOLUTION OF PROCEEDINGS BELOW RJG PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
09/20/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 - 14. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/30/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE IN 87-778 & 88-440 TO SEPTEM- BER 20TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD STATE
10/03/1988MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF ORDER 9/20/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER APLT IN 87-778 TO FILE COPY OF SUP MO W/IN 5 DAYS; DENY MO FOR RECONSIDERATION. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD CHECK
12/19/1988ANSWER/RESPONSE OF APLT IN 87-778. PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD ANS
03/23/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT MCFADDEN IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF 23-110 MO IN TR CT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/31/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN 87-778 & 88-440 TO ORDER 3/23/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD STATE
07/07/1989ORDER APLT IN 87-778 & 88-440 TO AD- VISE CRT IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD CHECK
09/05/1989MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (APLT) ORDER GRANTING STAY OF APPEAL OR TO SEVER APPEALS GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD 15-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD CHECK
11/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-15-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 112289 SCHPRD BE
11/27/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD OPA
12/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 19, 1989 AJ PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD BE
12/15/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 12/15/89. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO ADVANCE CASE ON DOCKET AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S MO TO ADVANCE CASE AND CLK DIRTD TO SCHD FOR CNSID WHEN BUS OF CT PERMITS PANELRO SCDATE 012390 SCHPRD N
03/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON AUM CAL OF 4/18/90. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD OPE
04/18/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/18/1990ARGUED PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART MOJ RV UUV CONVICTION...AF REMAINING JDGMT OF CONVICTION ..CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING PANELFETEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/01/1990LETTER OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO 28(K). MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990LETTER TO COUNSEL RETURNING CITATION AS UNTIMELY. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD