judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DWAIN WARREN LYNCH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0870
Short Caption:DWAIN WARREN LYNCH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:87-CF-0870Consolidated: 87-CF-0920
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8440-87Filed Date:08/03/1987

Opening Event Date:08/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/17/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/17/1987
Argued/Submitted:10/04/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDwain Warren Lynch N
James W. KleinNY
David A. ReiserYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LYNCH, DWAIN WARREN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MARTIN DEVORE NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/2/88 ORD: APPEAL NO. 88-98 NOTE - 02 IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT. NOTE - 03 FO THAT THE MO TO DISMISS NO. NOTE - 03 87-870 IS HEREBY DENIED. FO NOTE - 04 THAT APLT'S PETITION IN NO. NOTE - 04 87-870 FOR REH EB IS GRTD AND NOTE - 05 THAT THE OPIN. AND JMT OF NOTE - 05 11/17/87 ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTE - 06 FO THAT THE MANDATE ISSUED NOTE - 06 1/6/88 IS HEREBY RECALLED AND NOTE - 07 THE CLK OF THE SUP. CT. IS NOTE - 07 DIRTD TO TRANSMIT SAME TO THE NOTE - 08 CLK OF THIS COURT FORTHWITH. NOTE - 08 FO THAT THE CLK SHALL SCHD NOTE - 09 THIS MTR FOR ARGUMENT BEFORE NOTE - 09 THE COURT SITTING EN BANC AS NOTE - 10 SOON AS THE BUS. OF THE COURT NOTE - 10 PERMITS. COUNSEL ARE HEREBY NOTE - 11 DIRTD TO PROVIDE 10 COPIES OF NOTE - 11 BRFS HERETOFORE FILED TO THE NOTE - 12 CLERK ON OR BEFORE 6/14/88. NOTE - 12 (CHIEF JUDGE PRYOR AND ASSOC. NOTE - 13 JUDGE TERRY WOULD DENY REH. NOTE - 13 EN BANC.)
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/10/04 ACTION - EBARG ATTY 1 - REISERD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FARRELLM FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 87/09/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - REISERD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SPRAGUES FOR - APPELLEE
08/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF APPELLANT OF A PRETRIAL DENTION WITHOUT BOND AND FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1987RECEIVED AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF AN ORDER FOR PRETRIAL DETENTION WITHOUT BOND JB PANEL SCDATE 080787 SCHPRD OPE
08/12/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF DETENT ION GG PANEL SCDATE 082087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/31/1987AFFIRMED JUDGMENT DENYING MO FOR SUMM REVERSAL & AFFIRMING ORDER ON APPEAL. ACG PANELNBTE SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD CHECK
09/14/1987PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/17/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/17/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF (NO BRIEF - ADS ONLY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (9 PGS - BOSTON & 39 PGS - RUST) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1987ARGUED PANELPYTENB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1987AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF ORDER OF DETENTION (PUBLISHED @ 534 A.2d 658) PANELPYTENB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987AFFIRMED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1987ORDER APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO 1/14/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANELPY SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD ANSE EXTDTE 011488
01/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED RECALLED BY ORDER DATED 6/2/88 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S PET FOR REH/EN BANC PB PANEL SCDATE 011488 SCHPRD ANSE
04/19/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPP. MEMO RE CONTINUING CON- TROVERSY & NEED FOR RESOL. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS JB PANEL SCDATE 050388 SCHPRD OPA
06/02/1988MANDATE RECALLED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 13 (PUBLISHED @ 541 A.2d 1288) SL PANELEB SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD VS
06/14/1988RECEIVED 10 ADDITIONAL COPIES OF APPELLANT'S BRIEF FOR EN BANC ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD BA
06/17/1988RECEIVED 10 COPIES OF APLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL FOR EN BANC ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD BE
07/11/1988ORDER PARTIES TO FL BRFS BY 8/1/88 ON ISSUE OF WHETHER CAUSE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSD AS MOOT. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM ON THE ISSUES OF MOOTNESS RJG PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BE
08/01/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 7/28/88 SUPP BRF OF APLE TO EN BANC CRT. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM REGARDING MOOTNESS JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 8/1/88 SUPP BRF OF APLT. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS - WHALEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988EN BANC ARGUMENT PY MK NW FE BE TE RG ST SC PANELEB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988LETTER PDS & US TO FL RESPONSE TO THIS LTR IN 30 DAYS. ACG PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988RECEIVED SUBMISSION OF APPELLEE FOR USE IN DISPOSITION OF THE CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO OCTOBER 4TH COURT'S LETTER JB PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD ANSA
11/04/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING POST ARG MEMO OF APLT TO EN BANC CRT. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF ORDER OF DETENTION PANELEB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -NW CITE 557 A.2d 580
04/05/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0529 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 0000 (CONCURRING & DISSENTING) OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0000 (CONCURRING & DISSENTING)
04/25/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO MODIFY OPINION (UNOPPOSED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION TO MODIFY OPINION FILED 4/5/89 SL PANELEB SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD VS
05/30/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD