judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MACIO SINGLETON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0860
Short Caption:MACIO SINGLETON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12439-86Filed Date:07/24/1987

Opening Event Date:07/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/01/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMacio Singleton N
Bert W. KapinusYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SINGLETON, MACIO UNITED STATES
07/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERT W. KAPINUS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD R
09/24/1987ORDER DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (116 PGS - SWAGERTY) GG PANEL SCDATE 102887 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BR IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 18TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 121887 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (50 PGS - SWAGERTY) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT THE BR OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD EBP
02/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BA
03/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REVIEW ORDER DENYING BOND PENDING APPEAL & AFFIDAVIT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR REVIEW OF ORD DENY DEF. (SIC) BOND PEND APL RJG PANEL SCDATE 051788 SCHPRD OPE
07/01/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/01/1988SUBMITTED PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/14/1988ORDER DENY REQUEST FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL. ACG PANELFEROST SCDATE 063088 SCHPRD VS
07/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD