judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BENJAMIN DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0915
Short Caption:BENJAMIN DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10539-86Filed Date:08/05/1987

Opening Event Date:08/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBenjamin Davis N
R. Kenneth Mundy NN
AppellantBenjamin Davis N
Peter N. MannNY
AppellantBenjamin Davis N
Steven Weinberg NN
AppellantDavos. Benjamin Benjamin N
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, BENJAMIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/18/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 OF APLT TO RE-OPEN CASE & CASE NOTE - 02 IS REINSTATED & MANDATE RE- NOTE - 02 CALLED; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL NOTE - 03 STATE IN 20 INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 03 RT WILL BE ORDERED. NOTE - 04 2/21/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 04 STAY BRFG SCHD W/O PREJUDICE NOTE - 05 TO ITS RENEWAL AT THE TIME THE NOTE - 05 MO. PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SEC. NOTE - 06 23-110 IS FILED IN THE TRIAL NOTE - 06 COURT. NOTE - 07 3/24/89 ORD DENY APLT MO FO NOTE - 07 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF AND VACATE NOTE - 08 APMT OF PETER MANN, ESQ. AND NOTE - 08 APMT STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. AND NOTE - 09 NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL TO FL NOTE - 09 BRF OR APPRORIATE MOTION IN NOTE - 10 40 DAYS. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 5/12/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 11 COUNSEL FOR APLT FOR LV TO NOTE - 12 W/D & VACATE APPMT OF STEVEN NOTE - 12 WEINBERG & APPT RICHARD S. NOTE - 13 STOLKER FOR APLT; MR. WEINBERG NOTE - 13 TO TRANSMIT TO NEW COUNSEL ALL NOTE - 14 PAPERS NECESSARY FOR APPEAL; NOTE - 14 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 15 IN SUPERIOR COURT MLR NOTE - 15 NOTE - 16 8/8/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 16 TO EXT TM & APLT TO FL EITHER NOTE - 17 BRF BY 8/21/89 OR FL MO IN TRL NOTE - 17 CRT PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE 23- NOTE - 18 110 BY THAT DATE W/COPY TO NOTE - 18 THIS CRT. NOTE - 19 9/22/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 19 HOLD APPEAL IN ABEYANCE AND NOTE - 20 ALL PROCEEDINGS ARE HEREBY NOTE - 20 STAYED PDG DISP OF THE MOTION NOTE - 21 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SEC. NOTE - 21 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 22 FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 NOTE - 22 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS CT RE NOTE - 23 STATUS OF THE 23-110 MOTION. NOTE - 23 NOTE - 24 03/27/90 ORD: RICHARD S. NOTE - 24 STOLKER, ESQ., APTD TO REPT NOTE - 25 APLT IN 90-275; DSA IN 90-275 NOTE - 25 DUE WITHIN TEN DAYS. NOTE - 26 CON: 90-275 NOTE - 26
01/01/1906 MUNDYR VACATED MANNP VACATED 3/24/89 WEINBERGS VACATED 5/12/89.
08/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/24/1987ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA & PAY FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1987RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 24TH ORDER & MFP FILED PENDING IN SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IMMED UPON DISP OF FORMA PAUP MO IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
11/30/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TR CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD CHECK
01/05/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT W/IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/11-3-87 ORDER OR CASE DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121087 SCHPRD STATE
02/24/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURT'S ORDERS. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD STATE
03/03/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1988MANDATE ISSUED (RECALLED 5/18/88) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER PETER N. MANN APPT FOR APLT PURSUANT TO CJA & TO FL APPROP MO IN 20 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1988RECEIVED FORM 5 - APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1988ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL A RESPONSE TO 3/17/88 ORD IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RE-OPEN THE CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD ANSA
05/18/1988MANDATE RECALLED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD Q
06/10/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE TRANSCRIPTS MLH PANEL SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD STATE
08/12/1988ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD CHECK
08/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD STATE
09/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(111 PGS/ BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD RT
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(102 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(621 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 110588 SCHPRD RT
12/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/19/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN ORDER TO PREPARE 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 SL PANELRO SCDATE 021089 SCHPRD N
03/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/24/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 7-10 PB PANELMK SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPE
04/26/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD BA
05/11/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 5/7/89 FROM APPELLANT (PRO SE) REGARDING COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-14. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD GG
05/26/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 5/7/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/21/89 OR TO STAY APPEAL PENDING DISPOSITION OF 23-110 MOTION TO BE FILED (NOTE 15) PANEL SCDATE 062289 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/21/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD OPE
07/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-21-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD BA
08/04/1989LETTER TO CNSL FOR APLT REFERRING LTR RECVD FROM APLT SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 16-18. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD X
08/21/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD APPEAL IN ABEYANCE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR RELIEF UNDER 23 D.C. CODE 110 GT PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
09/22/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 19 THRU 23 SL PANELRO SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD Q
10/23/1989STATEMENT TO 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD STATE
12/08/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 1/7/90, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989STATEMENT IN RE TO 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD STATE
12/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(JUDGE KING-ORDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990STATEMENT TO 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD CHECK
03/15/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE STMT W/IN 30 DAYS RE STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 MOTION. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-915 & 90-275 FOR ALL PURP; FO (SEE NOTE FIELDS 24 - 25) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990STATEMENT OF COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/25/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1990ORDER DDIRG APLT TO FILE DSA IN 90- 275 W/IN 10 DAYS; BE DUE 30 DAYS FROM THIS ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-8-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BE
07/25/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-08-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD GR
08/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080890 SCHPRD BE
12/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1990SUBMITTED
12/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1991RECEIVED OF APLT FOR A NEW TRIAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1991LETTER REFER APLT'S LTR OF 5/16 TO COUNSEL FOR ADVICE W/I 10 DAYS MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT (PRO-SE) FOR A NEW TRIAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1991ORDER DENY APPELLANT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL W/O PREJ TO APLT SEEKING RELIEF IN TR CT. MEH PANELROFEBE SCDATE 053191 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1991RECEIVED LTR OF APLT RE PROVING HIS INNOCENCE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1991LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO LETTER OF 7/15/91, ADVISING OF MOJ FILED 12/21/90. PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT ASKING COURT TO ALLOW HIM TO TAKE A POLYGRAPH TEST PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991LETTER REFERRING 8/20/91 LTR FROM APLT TO F. BEANE FOR ACTION. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1991RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: ATTY AND CIRCUMSTANCES OF HIS CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD