judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTIN O. DE VORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0900
Short Caption:MARTIN O. DE VORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8152-87Filed Date:08/07/1987

Opening Event Date:08/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/07/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/13/1987
Argued/Submitted:08/14/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMartin O. De Vore N
Wendell C. RobinsonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DE VORE, MARTIN O. UNITED STATES
08/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/07/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/13/1987FiledBriefing Completed
08/14/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/25/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition