judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH C. REAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0844
Short Caption:KENNETH C. REAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2049-86Filed Date:07/20/1987

Opening Event Date:07/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth C. Reavis N
Donald W. Wisenor NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REAVIS, KENNETH C. UNITED STATES
07/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONALD WISENOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD DSA
09/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD R
09/21/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(278 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 103187 SCHPRD RT
11/24/1987ORDER COUNSEL TO FILE APLT BR W/IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 14, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 120487 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF DONALD WISENOR AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 3/16/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD DAS
09/12/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELTEKN SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD VS
09/12/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
10/04/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD