judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAPPIE HELM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0845
Short Caption:CAPPIE HELM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11798-86Filed Date:07/10/1987

Opening Event Date:07/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCappie Helm N
W. Scott Funger YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HELM, CAPPIE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MELVIN MILLS NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/12/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FUNGERW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - TOURISHT FOR - APPELLEE
07/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. SCOTT FUNGER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 090887 SCHPRD R
12/07/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(270 PGS. -- TOOBY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
01/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/1/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/1/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD X
02/03/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD BA
03/02/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BE
04/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/18/88 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BE
04/12/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/18/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040688 SCHPRD V
04/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/07/1988ARGUED PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 555 A.2d 465
03/17/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0434
04/07/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD