judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JORDAN, BERNICE MALONEY, HILDA

Case Information: 86-CV-0819
Short Caption:JORDAN, BERNICE MALONEY, HILDAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4036-84Filed Date:05/13/1986

Opening Event Date:05/13/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/14/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William P. LightfootYY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marc I. FiedlerYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald G. GuziakYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
F. Wainwright Barnes NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JORDAN, BERNICE MALONEY, HILDA
01/01/1906 FIEDLERM PRO HAC VICE
05/13/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/14/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/24/1987FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/15/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition