judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THERIUM M. BRISCOE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0917
Short Caption:THERIUM M. BRISCOE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5079-86Filed Date:08/05/1987

Opening Event Date:08/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTherium M. Briscoe N
Alfred J. Merlie YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Heidi M. Pasichow YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRISCOE, THERIUM M. UNITED STATES
08/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD R
12/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (119 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD RT
01/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
02/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT REQ FOR RT; FO: GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD M
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (52 PGS - ALLISON) PB PANEL SCDATE 050188 SCHPRD RT
03/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (14 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 050288 SCHPRD RT
03/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/28/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/28/88 (NO OPA) MLH DAS PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD BE
07/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 072888 SCHPRD BE
07/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD V
03/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/23/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD