Case: 01-96-00398-CV
01-96-00398-CV
03/22/1996
Miscellaneous/other civil
Caudle, Floria
Lindemann, Leslie Sharron
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/26/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/26/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/10/1998 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
07/10/1998 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
06/25/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/25/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/08/1998 | Submitted | | |
06/08/1998 | Submission | | |
06/08/1998 | Submitted | | |
05/15/1998 | Submission | | |
02/14/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/14/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/04/1997 | Brief Due | | |
01/10/1997 | Brief Due | | |
01/10/1997 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
01/10/1997 | Designation of counsel of record on appeal | | |
12/19/1996 | Order entered | | |
12/09/1996 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
12/07/1996 | No description available. | | |
11/27/1996 | Order entered | | |
07/31/1996 | Brief Due | | |
07/29/1996 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
07/18/1996 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
07/11/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
07/11/1996 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
06/21/1996 | Brief Due | | |
06/21/1996 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
06/21/1996 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
06/06/1996 | Correspondence | | |
05/16/1996 | Order entered | Grant motion | |
05/06/1996 | Motion for leave to file | | |
04/25/1996 | Order entered | | |
03/22/1996 | Transcript Received | | |
03/22/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/18/1996 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
03/18/1996 | Transcript filed | | |
01/22/1996 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
12/13/1995 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
11/17/1995 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/26/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Civil - Ad Litem | Martha Rovai |
State | Civil - Ad Litem | Sally Keys |
Caudle, Floria | Appellant | Floria Caudle Steven Valikones Miller B Walker |
Trial Court Information
328th District Court
Fort Bend
Honorable THOMAS O. STANSBURY
91,543/91,543-W