judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARNEST MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0825
Short Caption:EARNEST MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F44-86Filed Date:07/10/1987

Opening Event Date:07/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarnest Moore N
Daniel M. Schember YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOORE, EARNEST UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/3/88 TO FILE BRIEF MLR NOTE - 01
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
07/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082587 SCHPRD DSA
09/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (1490 PGS - RAMOS) 3 VOLS. GT PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/14/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/14/88-ANFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD Q
10/14/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PARTIAL RE- CONSIDERATION OF ORDER 8/31/88 & TO EXTEND TIME TO (NOTE 1) PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO RECONSIDERATION AND FOR LEAVE TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD V
01/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE APPELLEE'S MLR PANEL SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1989APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONTO JANUARY 31ST TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE JB PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD OPA
01/24/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO TO MO FOR SUMM AFFIRM TO 1/31/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD X
01/31/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIR- MANCE RJG PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD OPA
06/12/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO FOR SUMM AFFIRMANCE & AFFIRMING JUDGMNT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELBETE SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD VS
06/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
06/26/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLANT TO JULY 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PETITION AND PET FOR REH EN BANC DUE ON OR BEFORE 7/6/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD OPE
07/03/1989ORDER APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD MRBA
09/27/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD