judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL ALBERT FRENZEL v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES

Case Heading (06-163)
Case Number:06-163Case Docketed On:07/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PAUL ALBERT FRENZEL v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES
Full Title:PAUL ALBERT FRENZEL, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul Albert Frenzel Pro Se
AppelleeDepartment of Family ServicesPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Dan S. Wilde
Jacob L. Brooks

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 50
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (NOA was untimely filed due to delay in appellant providing docket fee. District Clerk sent letter requesting docket fee 06/07/06)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/28/2006Order - Other - requiring briefing on jurisdictional issueOrderOtherFinal
07/31/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee re briefing of jurisdictional issue; not served with any pleadings. Copied Clerk's file.EventPhone CallFinal
08/01/2006Correspondence - Outgoing to appellant re "Brief in Support of Notice of Appeal"CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
08/14/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/02/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
10/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/11/2006Brief - Appellant reply, does not contain original signatureBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/18/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, Volume One, Original Papers (Copy of letter missing from file)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/24/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2007Motion - Other -request for disposition and status of above listed civil actionMotionOtherFinal
02/27/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - letter re status of caseCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
03/21/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, dismissing appeal. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/28/2007Petition (motion) - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
04/11/2007Order - Petition (motion) for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal