judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RENNELLS (EDWIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38104
Short Caption:RENNELLS (EDWIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44040
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000857Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-11066
07/19/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/16/01; 5/10/01; 6/8/01; 6/21/01. Court Reporters: Eric V. Nelson, Kate Murray & Cindy Lee Brown. 01-12315
08/03/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-13181
08/03/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13182
08/03/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-13183
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 3, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this appeal. Because counsel for appellant has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b), the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. Appellate counsel may file a supplemental fast track statement "if appellate counsel can assert material issues which should be considered and which were not raised in the fast track statement." Such supplemental fast track statement must be filed within twenty days of appellate counsel's appointment. 01-13780
08/17/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-14041
08/28/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order directing appellant to submit an affidavit of indigency and a request for appointment of appellate counsel, or to secure appellate counsel filed in district court on August 23, 2001. 01-14577
11/05/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on November 1, 2001. The Washoe County Public Defender is appointed to represent appellant in this matter. 01-18487
11/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender. 01-19307
11/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to Elect not to file a Supplemental Fast Track Statement. 01-19571
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Rennells' contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21131
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00513
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00513