judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOWARD W. MATHEWS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0853
Short Caption:HOWARD W. MATHEWS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6650-85Filed Date:07/17/1987

Opening Event Date:07/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/16/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/1987
Argued/Submitted:10/27/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHoward W. Mathews N
Frederick J. Sullivan YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MATHEWS, HOWARD W. UNITED STATES
07/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/29/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/27/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition