judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES A. FLOWERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0855
Short Caption:JAMES A. FLOWERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Lead:87-CF-0855Consolidated: 87-CF-1025
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6522-86Filed Date:07/21/1987

Opening Event Date:07/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/28/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames A. Flowers N
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FLOWERS, JAMES A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: EDWARD SPARKS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 032488 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 02 TO CONS 87-855 & 87-1025; FO: NOTE - 03 GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE NOTE - 03 BR & CLK TO FILE LDGD BR OF NOTE - 04 APLT IN 87-855; FO: CONS BR OF NOTE - 04 APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTER APLT BR NOTE - 05 IS FILED IN 87-1025. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 87-1025 NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WILLIAMSJOHNE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - COLLINSS FOR - APPELLEE
07/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
09/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD R
01/25/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/25/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (550 PGS - MILLER) JB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD RT
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
03/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD OPE
04/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 6, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040688 SCHPRD BA
04/07/1988RECEIVED ADDENDUM TO APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO IN NO. 87-1025 TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF TO 5/6/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD CHECK
05/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF OF APPELLANT FILED IN 87-1025 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN NO. 87-1025 TO 6/3/88- ANFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD V
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1025 (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 060388 SCHPRD BA
06/06/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-1025 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN 87-1025 CLK TO FL BRF; APLE CON BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS.PB PANELPY SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD V
07/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 22ND (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BE
08/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/23/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BE
08/31/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/23/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD CHECK
09/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF ONE DAY OUT OF TIME GT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD OPA
02/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 3/28/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD OPE
03/28/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/28/1989ARGUED PANELMKBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELMKBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 7/27/89, FROM CLERK, SUPREME COURT, TO APPELLANT'S COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1989RECEIVED FROM THE SUPREME COURT COPY OF A LETTER DENYING MOT TO EXTEND TM TO FILE PET FOR CERT. GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD