judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN D. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0854
Short Caption:KEVIN D. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1047-87Filed Date:07/23/1987

Opening Event Date:07/23/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/09/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin D. Taylor N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAYLOR, KEVIN D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES T. BROWN, DAVID NOTE - 01 E. BURROUGHS AND NOTE - 02 RICHARD L. JOHNSON NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 011188 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-854, NOTE - 03 87-934, 87-993 & 87-1068; FO: NOTE - 04 APLTS BRIEFS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. NOTE - 06 10/19/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 06 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-933 TO NOTE - 07 W/D & VACATE APPMT OF ROBERT NOTE - 07 H. HAAS & CLK TO ENTR APPRNC NOTE - 08 OF CARL V. ANGELIS AS RETAINED NOTE - 08 COUNSEL FOR APLT; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 09 APLT IN 87-1068 TO EXT TM TO NOTE - 09 FL BRF TO 11/18/88; BRF OF NOTE - 10 APLT IN 87-993 DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 2/7/89 ORD GRT APLT MO TO STAY NOTE - 11 APPEAL PENING DISPOSITION ON NOTE - 12 MO TO VACATE SENT FILED IN THE NOTE - 12 SP CT AND SERV COPY ON THIS CT NOTE - 13 FUR ORD COUNSEL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 13 30 DAY SHALL ADVISE THIS CT NOTE - 14 REGARDING STATUS OF MO TO NOTE - 14 VACATE. FAILURE TO NOTIFY THIS NOTE - 15 CT WITHIN 5 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT NOTE - 15 OF NOTICE OF DISP OF MO PEND- NOTE - 16 ING IN SP CT WILL BE NON-COMP NOTE - 16 LIANCE W/GEN RULES OF THIS CT. NOTE - 17 3/1/89 ORD: CNSL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 17 NO. 87-1068 W/I 10 DAYS IS NOTE - 18 DIRTD TO COMPLY WITH THIS CT'S NOTE - 18 1/11/89 ORDER OR SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 19 WHY HIS APPTMT SHOULD NOT BE NOTE - 19 VACATED. NOTE - 20 4/19/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 20 NO. 87-993 AND THE CLERK IS NOTE - 21 DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED BRF NOTE - 21 OF APLT. FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT NOTE - 22 IN NO. 87-1068 SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 22 THIS COURT W/I 30 DAYS RE NOTE - 23 STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION PDG IN NOTE - 23 THE TRIAL COURT. FO THAT NOTE - 24 APPEAL NO. 87-1068 IS HEREBY NOTE - 24 SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOS. NOTE - 25 87-854, 87-934 AND 87-993 W/O NOTE - 25 PREJ. TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED NOTE - 26 AFTER DISP OF THE 23-110 MO. NOTE - 26 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 27 4/21/89 ORD: APPEAL NO. 87-854 NOTE - 27 IS HEREBY SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOTE - 28 NOS. 87-934 & 87-993 W/O PREJ. NOTE - 28 TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED AFTER NOTE - 29 DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION NOTE - 29 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SECTION NOTE - 30 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 30 FO THAT THE BRF OF APLE IN NOTE - 31 NOS. 87-934 & 87-993 SHALL BE NOTE - 31 FILED W/I 30 DAYS. NOTE - 32 11/15/89 ORD: STATUS OF MOT NOTE - 32 TO VACATE FILED IN TR CT NOTE - 33 4/12/90 ORD: SS, CONS 87-854 & NOTE - 33 90-376; CALVIN STEINMETZ APPTD NOTE - 34 FOR APLT IN 90-376; APLT IN NOTE - 34 90-376 TO FL DSA IN 10. NOTE - 35 CON 90-376 NOTE - 35 NOTE - 36 3/21/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF TO NOTE - 36 W/D THE MO FOR STAY OF BRFNG NOTE - 37 SCHED; GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT NOTE - 37 TM TO FL ITS BRF & THE CLK TO NOTE - 38 FL BRF OF APLE; CLK TO SCHED NOTE - 38 CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.
07/23/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
09/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD R
11/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (232 PGS - BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (576 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD RT
03/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (187 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD RT
07/26/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 010888 SCHPRD RT
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-934 TO OCTOBER 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 87-934 FOR EX TO FILE BR TO 10/5-NFX; APLTS BR IN CON CASES DUE 9/6/88.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (ROBERT H. HAAS) COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-993 UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988RECEIVED IN 87-993 APLT'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-934. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988LETTER TRANSMITTING AFFIDAVIT TO THE SUP. CT. FOR CONSIDERATION SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(39 PGS/SWARINGER) IN 87-993 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO NOVEMBER 18TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-10. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
10/31/1988ORDER DENY APLT PRO SE MO FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL IN 87-1068. ACG PANELFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL IN 87-1068 PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/28/88 (NO OPE) IN #87-993 GT PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/89 (NO OPE) IN 87-993 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 21 IN NO. 87-1068 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S 23-110 MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION AND SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN 87-993 TO 1/27/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD CHECK
02/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 11-16 PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/21/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RECORD MATERIAL RELIED UPON (LIST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/23/89 (NO OPE) FILED IN #87-993 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-993 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-993 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 THRU 19 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING MOTION PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE #23-110 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 87-993 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 20 THRU 26 SL PANELRO SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD Q
04/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 27 THRU 31 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989RECEIVED STATUS OF TRIAL COURT MOTION GT PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD CHECK
04/27/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATUS REPORT OUT OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 050489 SCHPRD CHECK
07/10/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APLT IN 87-993 TO 7/17/89 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1989ORDER GRANT MOTION AND FILE LODGED STATEMENT, FO APLT IS TO AD- VISE THIS COURT UPON DISP. PB PANELRO SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD N
09/12/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO FL STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 MOT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1989STATEMENT TO 23-110 MO PENDING IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD STATE
11/15/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 11/27/89, TO FILE STMT RE (SEE NOTE FIELD 32) FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989STATEMENT RE 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD STATE
03/06/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 30 DAYS, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990STATEMENT OF TRIAL COURT MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD STATE
03/20/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 30 DAYS, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF MOT IN TRIAL CT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL & MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE RJG PANEL SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD STATE
03/30/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLE SHALL BE FILED IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD V
04/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 33 & 34. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 90-376 PANEL SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD DSA
05/15/1990RECORD ON APPEAL IN 90-376 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY SEE 87-1068 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 90-376 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE'S TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING SCHD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 90-376 TO 9-14-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF COUNSEL OF APLT IN 87-1068 TO ACCEPT APLT'S PRO SE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 IN 87-1068 (100 PGS. -- RONAN; 30 PGS. -- RONAN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1991FiledBriefing Completed
03/21/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 36-38. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD CHECK
05/09/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/09/1991SUBMITTED PANELFESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD