Case: 06-09-00022-CR
06-09-00022-CR
01/27/2009
Aggravated Robbery
Juan Ballesteros
The State of Texas
No
12th Court of Appeals
01/27/2009
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/05/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
06/19/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/24/2010 | Mandate issued | | |||||
03/24/2010 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
02/10/2010 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | WRIT REFUSED | | ||||
01/07/2010 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
11/30/2009 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
11/18/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/03/2009 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | | ||||
10/28/2009 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
10/27/2009 | Motion disposed | Overruled | | ||||
10/20/2009 | Motion filed | | |||||
09/29/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/24/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
09/11/2009 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/31/2009 | Submitted | | |||||
08/10/2009 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
08/05/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
08/05/2009 | Oral argument waiver by one party | | |||||
08/05/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/05/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
08/05/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/05/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
07/21/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/21/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/19/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
05/27/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/20/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/16/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/16/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/17/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
03/03/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/03/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
01/28/2009 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
01/27/2009 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
01/27/2009 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Sixth Court of Appeals | | ||||
01/23/2009 | Notice of late record | | |||||
12/18/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Court packet sent to parties | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
12/12/2008 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |||||
12/10/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
11/20/2008 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | | |||||
11/20/2008 | Trial court certification filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/24/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/24/2010 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Michael J. West |
Ballesteros, Juan | Appellant | Juan Ballesteros |
Ballesteros, Juan | Appellant | James W. Huggler Jr. |
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
Honorable Kerry L. Russell
007-0955-08
Life/TDCJ-CID & $10,000 Fine