judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AIR LINE EMPLOYEES ASSOCIATIONKATZ, DANIEL M.

Case Information: 86-CV-0896
Short Caption:AIR LINE EMPLOYEES ASSOCIATIONKATZ, DANIEL M.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA0955-86Filed Date:06/17/1986

Opening Event Date:06/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/28/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1986
Argued/Submitted:10/14/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Martin R. Ganzglass YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Philip L. Kellogg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James L. Lyons NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AIR LINE EMPLOYEES ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL KATZ, DANIEL M.
06/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/28/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1986FiledBriefing Completed
10/14/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/26/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition