judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BUSTER, KAREN DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CV-0886
Short Caption:BUSTER, KAREN DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4782-82Filed Date:06/10/1986

Opening Event Date:06/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Wiley A. Branton NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Peggy A. Miller NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BUSTER, KAREN ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL
01/01/1906 BRANTONWI 4/9/87 WITHDRAW.
06/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition