judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUGHES, LITTLETREE RAGAZZI, GIORGIO

Case Information: 86-CV-0883
Short Caption:HUGHES, LITTLETREE RAGAZZI, GIORGIOClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA0537-86Filed Date:06/06/1986

Opening Event Date:06/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/06/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/05/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/02/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Claude W. RoxboroughYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Nancy N. Fey YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUGHES, LITTLETREE RAGAZZI, GIORGIO
06/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/06/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/05/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/02/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition