judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOLMES, GILBERT HOME REALTY INC.

Case Information: 86-CV-0827
Short Caption:HOLMES, GILBERT HOME REALTY INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT18154-86Filed Date:06/06/1986

Opening Event Date:06/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/29/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/19/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/26/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Morris R. BattinoYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Eric Sanne YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael E. BrandNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLMES, GILBERT HOME REALTY INC.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/1/86 ORD: GRANT MO. CLK NOTE - 01 DIRECTED TO FILE LODGED DR/SRT NOTE - 02 FO APLT'S BRIEF DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 02 AFTER FILING OF RECORD TTC NOTE - 03 3/31/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 03 SUPPL AND EXT TM TO FILE A NOTE - 04 FURTHER REPLY BRF AND THE NOTE - 04 AFORESAID MOTION AND NOTE - 05 ATTACHMENTS SHALL BE DEEMED NOTE - 05 PART OF THE REPLY BRF OF APLT NOTE - 06 FILED HEREIN ON 3/2/88. NOTE - 06
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/10/26 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BATTINOM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SANNEE FOR - APPELLEE
06/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/06/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL & FOR IMMEDIATE CONSIDERATION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DR & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 061186 SCHPRD OPE
06/12/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS & AUTHORITIES TO APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1986ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY SL PANELFETE SCDATE 061186 SCHPRD VS
07/01/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 AND 2 TTC PANELPY SCDATE 062386 SCHPRD OPE
07/10/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY AND/OR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL & REQUEST FOR ORAL HEARING ON THIS MOTION GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S REQUEST FOR STAY ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072286 SCHPRD OPE
07/23/1986ORDER DENYING MO FOR STAY AND/OR INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL. CWC PANELFETE SCDATE 071486 SCHPRD VS
10/20/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 082986 SCHPRD R
12/05/1986RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER FROM SUP CT GRANTING F.P. & TRANSCRIPT MLH (JUDGE CUSHIONBERRY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/29/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS - BOSTON; 79 PGS - BOSTON) GG PANEL SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD RT
05/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AFTER COMPLETE RECORD IS FILED MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD BA
09/02/1987ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAY TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
09/03/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD STATE
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (10 PGS - HAWKINS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S REPLY TO APPELLANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO APLT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL AS MOOT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1987ORDER REFER MO TO DISMISS TO MERITS DIV UPON ASSIGNMENT; APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. PANELFEST SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD CHECK
10/20/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY TO OPPO TO MO TO DISMISS. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD SL
01/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BA
01/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/1/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD N
02/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1988ORDER CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT & APLE & SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD BA
03/02/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1988MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 6 SL PANELPY SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD Q
07/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT (SEE MOTION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988ORDER HOLD MO OF APLE TO DISMISS IN ABEY PEDNG ORAL ARG & CONSID. OF MERITS DIVISION. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072188 SCHPRD VS
09/12/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO POSTPONE. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072888 SCHPRD VS
10/26/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/26/1988ARGUED PANELMKSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988AFFIRMED ORDER/JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT PANELMKSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE (ORDER/JUDGMENT)
11/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD