judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAYLOR, PHILIP M. CANADY, THEODORE R.

Case Information: 86-CV-0816
Short Caption:TAYLOR, PHILIP M. CANADY, THEODORE R.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA0539-86Filed Date:05/14/1986

Opening Event Date:05/14/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/08/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/13/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David M. Lacivita YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Cynthia S. Miraglia NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Frank J. Martell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAYLOR, PHILIP M. CANADY, THEODORE R. ET AL
01/01/1906 MIRAGLIAC PRO HAC VICE
05/14/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/28/1986FiledRecord Completed
01/08/1987FiledBriefing Completed
05/13/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/25/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition