judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WARREN, WALTER E. CHAPMAN, DUDLEY H.

Case Information: 86-CV-0815
Short Caption:WARREN, WALTER E. CHAPMAN, DUDLEY H.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA15806-82Filed Date:05/19/1986

Opening Event Date:05/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/23/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/21/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/09/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWalter E. Warren NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
John C. Hayes YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas G. CorcoranYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WARREN, WALTER E. CHAPMAN, DUDLEY H.
05/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1986FiledRecord Completed
01/21/1987FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition