judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS T. CALDWELL, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0891
Short Caption:THOMAS T. CALDWELL, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12131-86Filed Date:07/31/1987

Opening Event Date:07/31/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/07/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas T. Caldwell, Jr.N
Anita Isicson NN
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
Joanne Roney HepworthNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CALDWELL JR., THOMAS T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/22/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF JOANNE RONEY HEPWORTH & NOTE - 02 APPT ANITS ISICSON FOR APLT; NOTE - 03 NEW COUNSEL TO INFORM CRT IN NOTE - 03 20 DAYS WHETHER SUPP BRF WILL NOTE - 04 BE FILED ON BEHALF OF APLT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 1/3/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT FOR STAY & TO W/D & NOTE - 06 CASE STAYED PENDG F/O OF CRT; NOTE - 06 APPMT OF CALVIN STEINMETZ & NOTE - 07 ANITA ISICSON VACATED & G. NOTE - 07 GODWIN OYEWOLE APPTD FOR APLT; NOTE - 08 CASE REMOVED FROM REG CAL OF NOTE - 08 1/4/89. NOTE - 09 5/21/90 ORD: CLK TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 09 A COPY OF THE COMPLETE RECORD NOTE - 10 ON APPEAL, INCLUDING A COPY OF NOTE - 10 APLT'S MO FOR WITHDRAWAL OF NOTE - 11 GUILTY PLEA, TO THE TRIAL CT NOTE - 11 FOR THE PURPOSE OF RECON- NOTE - 12 STRUCTING THE TRIAL CT FILE; NOTE - 12 COUNSEL FOR APLT IS DIRECTED NOTE - 13 TO FILE A STMT W/IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 13 ADVISING THIS CT OF THE STATUS NOTE - 14 OF APLT'S MO FOR WITHDRAWAL OF NOTE - 14 GUILTY PLEA IN THE TRIAL CT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - OYEWOLEG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - COWDENW FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 HEPWORTHJ VACATED 7/22/88. ISICSONA VACATED 1/3/89
07/31/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOANNE RONEY HEPWORTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 093087 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD DSA
10/22/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091087 SCHPRD DSA
10/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (39 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
11/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (24 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD RT
11/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 012888 SCHPRD BA
02/19/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD N
03/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 032188 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/26/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 042688 SCHPRD BE
05/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 7, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 6/7/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD V
06/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 060788 SCHPRD BE
06/23/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 6/25/88 (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL REPLY BRF TO EXTENT RBA DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 063088 SCHPRD CHECK
07/12/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 071488 SCHPRD Q
08/10/1988APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO TO AUGUST 25TH JB PANEL SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD SMA
08/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL OR REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988ORDER CLK IS DIRTD TO CALENDAR CASE FOR CONSID. BEF A MERITS DIV. AS SOON AS BUS. PERMITS SL PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD N
11/04/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CALVIN STEINMETZ TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL & FOR LEAVE TO WITH- DRAW AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD OPE
02/07/1989ORDER APLT COUNS IN 15 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: MO TO W/DRAW GUILTY PLEA BEEN FILED IN TR CT? EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD CHECK
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE OF APPELLANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 2-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 022289 SCHPRD STATE
02/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE, ETC MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION(S) FROM APLT: RENEWAL MO FOR JMT OF ACQUIT- TAL OR NEW TRIAL, ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SECOND RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/7/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER APLT TO INFORM THIS COURT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO THE STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TRIAL COURT. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(ORDER JUDGE WALTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF TRL CRT PROCEEDINGS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD ANSA
06/08/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 24TH ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD STATE
07/20/1989ORDER APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FL STATEMNT RE STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING IN SUPERIOR CRT. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S JULY 20, 1989 ORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD ANSA
09/12/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989STATEMENT RE STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD STATE
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR NEW ATTORNEY GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOTIONS FOR NEW ATTORNEY AND FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 20 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 2/22/90 ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990MEMORANDUM COPY OF COMPLETE RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO APPEALS COORDINATOR'S OFFICE THIS DATE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-14 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD CHECK
07/02/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL STATEMENT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD K
08/21/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER RE PENDING TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 091790 SCHPRD ANSA
02/07/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/07/1991ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1991REMANDED JUDGMENT RM CAUSE TO TRIAL CT FOR RESENTENCING ON THE CONTEMPT CHARGE PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 595 A.2d 961
06/27/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 1875
07/11/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO JULY 25, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE ON OR BEFORE 7/25/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 072391 SCHPRD OPA
08/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1991RECEIVED FROM APLT RE COPY OF MANDATE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD