judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARVEY HARLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0899
Short Caption:HARVEY HARLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F91837-76Filed Date:07/31/1987

Opening Event Date:07/31/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/23/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/14/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarvey Harley N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Heidi M. Pasichow YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARLEY, HARVEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/11/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO PROCEED IN FORMA NOTE - 02 PAUPERIS & CLK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 02 TO TRANSMIT RECORD W/OUT FEE NOTE - 03 FORTHWITH; MINDY A. DANIELS NOTE - 03 APPTD TO REPRESNET APLT ON NOTE - 04 APPEAL; NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 NOTE - 05 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER RT NOTE - 05 WILL BE ORDERED & PREPARED FOR NOTE - 06 APPEAL. NOTE - 06
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PASICHOWH FOR - APPELLEE
07/31/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD RBH
09/30/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 11TH ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD STATE
10/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD R
10/06/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 16, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD BA
12/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 15TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 121687 SCHPRD BA
12/31/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/15/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD CHECK
01/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 011588 SCHPRD BA
02/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/22/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 26TH (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 26, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 042688 SCHPRD BE
05/19/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/26/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD V
06/02/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/23/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 7/29 PRO SE BRF TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/11/1989ARGUED PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/10/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC APPELLANT-TO 2/17/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC ON OR BEF 2/17/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD CHECK
02/17/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD MRRB
02/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN US SUPREME COURT ON JUNE 1, 1989 #88-7582 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 10-2-89 #88-7582 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO RECALL MANDATE & REOPEN THE DIRECT APPEAL OF APLT'S CRIMINAL CONVICTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO APLT'S MO TO RECALL MANDATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MOTION TO EXT TM TO FL RESPONSE TO PRO SE MOT TO RECALL MANDATE TO 11/1. MEH PANELFESTMK SCDATE 090490 SCHPRD OPE
11/01/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD CHECK
11/26/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S ATTORNEY OPPO TO APLT'S MO TO RECALL MANDATE & REOPEN APLT'S CONVICTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE MOT TO RECALL MANDATE & REOPEN DIRECT APPEAL W/STATEMENT. MEH PANELFESTMK SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD VS