judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HERMAN A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0824
Short Caption:HERMAN A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6368-85Filed Date:07/16/1987

Opening Event Date:07/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHerman A. Thompson N
Thomas G. Ross NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMPSON, HERMAN A. AKA CALVIN L. RUFFIN UNITED STATES
07/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD R
09/24/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDERED FOR THIS APPEAL.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082087 SCHPRD RT
10/07/1987RECEIVED STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
10/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT CONCERNING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD CHECK
10/20/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MOS, CLK TO FILE LDGD DSA & SRT, FO: APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD OPE
11/30/1987STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT WILL NOT BE ORDERED) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 21ST JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 24, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 022188 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 3/24/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031088 SCHPRD N
03/31/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD BA
04/06/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE 5/6/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD Q
10/05/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/05/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO W/DRAW & DISMISS APPEAL AS MOOT. ACG PANELMKBE SCDATE 090988 SCHPRD VS
10/05/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
10/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD