judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD L. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0823
Short Caption:RICHARD L. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1314-86Filed Date:07/16/1987

Opening Event Date:07/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/12/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard L. Jones N
James G. Mcguire YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Henry S. Hoberman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, RICHARD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MANUEL THILLET, MICHAEL NOTE - 01 RAMOS, ELVIN SOTO, JAMES TOSS NOTE - 02 041289 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 02 FILE SUP TO APLT'S BR & LDGD NOTE - 03 SUP IS FILED; FO: GRANT APLE NOTE - 03 MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR & LDGD NOTE - 04 BR IS FILED; FO: CASE TO BE NOTE - 04 SCHED FOR CONS AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 05 BIZ OF THE CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 05
07/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES G. McGUIRE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
09/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD R
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (396 PGS - SWARINGER) PB PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (177 PGS - MITCHELL) GT PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/1/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 30, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER DENIED APLT'S MOTIONS FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REF TO BPR. PB PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD V
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
02/02/1989ORDER DIRG BE BE FLD W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE SCHD ON R & BA ALONE.FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1989APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER & REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 021289 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1989ORDER GRANT REQ OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD X
04/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/12/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD M
04/12/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT TO APLT'S BRIEF. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1989SUBMITTED PANELTEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBETERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RY CITE 566 A.2d 44
11/13/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RY PAGE # - 2839
12/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD