judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PERNELL BELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0841
Short Caption:PERNELL BELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7406-86Filed Date:07/24/1987

Opening Event Date:07/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:02/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/23/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPernell Bell N
Roger C. Wesley YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Kelly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELL, PERNELL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOHN FRANKLIN, NOTE - 01 TYRONE LOWRY NOTE - 02 031888 ORDER: CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 02 TRANSMIT RT OF 5/12-5/19/87 NOTE - 03 TRIAL PROCEEDINGS TO THIS CT NOTE - 03 AS A SUP REC FORTHWITH; FO: NOTE - 04 GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE NOTE - 04 BR ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT NOTE - 05 APLT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 05 RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. NOTE - 06 1/24/89 ORD: GRANT REQ OF TRL NOTE - 06 JUDGE TO REMAND CASE FOR PUR- NOTE - 07 POST OF CONSIDERING MO TO RE- NOTE - 07 DUCE SENTENCE; CLK OF SUPER NOTE - 08 CRT TO TRANSMIT ORD DISPOSING NOTE - 08 MO TO RECUDE SENTENCE AS SUPP NOTE - 09 REC IMMEDIATELY AFTER ITS NOTE - 09 ENTRY & CASE SHALL REMAIN ON NOTE - 10 SUM CAL OF 2/1/89. NOTE - 10
07/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD R
09/24/1987ORDER DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(151 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
03/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (325 PGS - MILLER) JB PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD RT
05/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF (HEARING REQUESTED) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD BA
06/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/11/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 061088 SCHPRD BE
07/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 18, 1988 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-10. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD VS
01/31/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING COPY OF TRL CRT ORDER IN RESP TO 1/24/89 ORD TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/01/1989SUBMITTED SL PANELFESTPY SCDATE 020189 SCHPRD CSUM
02/02/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL SL PANELFESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/23/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD