judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1540
Short Caption:ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13090-77Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdul Rahman N
Barbara L. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAHMAN, ABDUL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 8901542 NOTE - 01
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/09/1990ORDER APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DSA, DR/SRT & $50 W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE MAY BE DISMISSED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
05/02/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/02/1990ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY W COURT'S 4/9/90, ORD. GW PANELRO SCDATE 042690 SCHPRD V
05/02/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD