judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. HARDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1494
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. HARDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F926-89Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Harden N
Roger C. Wesley NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael J. Dennis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARDEN, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 06/14/90 ORD: MO TO SUBSTITUTE NOTE - 01 COUNSEL IS GRANTED & THE NOTE - 02 APPTMT OF ROGER WESLEY, ESQ., NOTE - 02 IS VACATED, & MICHAEL DENNIS, NOTE - 03 IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 03 ON APPEAL; F/O THAT NEWLY- NOTE - 04 APPOINTED COUNSEL TO ADVISE NOTE - 04 THIS CRT W/IN 20 DAYS WHETHER NOTE - 05 HE INTENDS TO FL A SUPPLMNTL NOTE - 05 BRF ON BEHALF OF APLT.
01/01/1906 WESLEYR VACATED 6/14/90
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSCRIPT (216-PGS/RONAN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD BA
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD V
03/13/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-22-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(44 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD RT
04/09/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/22/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD B
04/23/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 042290 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DENNIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THUR 5 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD V
09/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD RDEC
10/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD