judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOMER L. RICHARDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1492
Short Caption:HOMER L. RICHARDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:89-CF-1492Consolidated: 91-CO-0805
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F612-88Filed Date:12/14/1989

Opening Event Date:12/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/14/1992Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/02/1993
Argued/Submitted:12/09/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/1995

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHomer L. Richards N
Barbara E. SosnickYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICHARDS, HOMER L. AKA HOMER RICHARDS,LEWIS PAYNE UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SWARINGER, 11/28/88, ORDERED 1/13/92 UNLISTED, 1/10/89, ORDERED 1/18/92 WATKINS, 12/6/89, ORDERED 1/13/92
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/6/9O ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 TO STAY BRFG SCHD & APPEAL IS NOTE - 02 HEREBY STAYD PENDG F/O OF THIS NOTE - 02 CRT; F/O COUNS FOR APLT TO FL NOTE - 03 A STATEMENT W/THIS CRT W/IN 30 NOTE - 03 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF MO FOR NOTE - 04 NEW TRIAL. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 02/14/91 ORD: GRANTG COUNS MO NOTE - 05 TO WITHDRAW AS COUNS & APPMNT NOTE - 06 OF JAMES KLEIN, ESQ IS VAC & NOTE - 06 BARBARA E. SOSNIC, ESQ IS NOTE - 07 APPOINTD TO REPRESENT APLT;F/O NOTE - 07 FORMER COUNS TO TRANSMIT ALL NOTE - 08 DOC TO NEWLY-APPOINTD COUNS; NOTE - 08 F/O NEWLY-APPOINTD COUNS TO NOTE - 09 ADVISE THIS CRT AS TO STATUS NOTE - 09 OF PEND MO FL IN TRL COURT. NOTE - 10 8/13/91 ORD: SUA SPONTE APPEAL NOTE - 10 NOS. 89-1492 & 91-805 ARE NOTE - 11 CONSOL.; APMT OF GERALD I NOTE - 11 FISHER, ESQ IS VACATED; NOTE - 12 BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ IS NOTE - 12 APPTD AS CNSL FOR APLT HEREIN; NOTE - 13 ATTY FISHER TO TRANSMIT ALL NOTE - 13 DOCS. PERTAINING TO APPEAL TO NOTE - 14 NEWLY-APPTD CNSL; APLT TO FL NOTE - 14 DSA IN BOTH APPEALS WITHIN 10 NOTE - 15 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS NOTE - 15 ORDER. NOTE - 16 CONS: 91-805 NOTE - 16
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 2/14/91
12/14/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/02/1990ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
01/30/1990RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM PIRFO - 9/25/89 PROCEEDING (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD RT
02/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD R
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(199 PGS/ PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051090 SCHPRD RT
02/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(358 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD SR
03/05/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR WRAY CERTIFICATION OF 9/26/89 - 9/28/89 PROCEEDING (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(408 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (89-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (23-PGS/EDLEY-42-PGS/BOSTON AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(360 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 051290 SCHPRD RT
10/01/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BA
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (14-PGS/RONAN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (ORDER J. SHUKER 9/25/90) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (67 PGS. -- RONAN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4. GW PANELRO SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD TO
01/04/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE PENDING NEW TRIAL MOTION & MO TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL & APPT. OF SUCCESSOR PANEL SCDATE 010791 SCHPRD STATE
01/14/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9(ORDER JUDGE SHUKER DATED 11-13-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 9 GW PANELRO SCDATE 013191 SCHPRD GG
04/29/1991ORDER DIR. APLT TO FL STATE AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TR CT OF APPT. VACATED UNDER CJA. AD PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1991STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TRIAL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 050991 SCHPRD STATE
05/31/1991ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO ADVISE OF STATUS OF NEW TR MO IN 30 DAYS DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061491 SCHPRD CHECK
07/01/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (MEMORANDUM & OPINION OF JUDGE SHUKER DATED 6/4/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1991ORDER APLT'S CNSL TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF TRIAL CRT MO OR APMT VACATED. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 070391 SCHPRD V
08/02/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE TRIAL COURT DENYING APLT MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD STATE
08/13/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-15. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 080691 SCHPRD V
08/23/1991APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082391 SCHPRD DSA
08/28/1991RECORD ON APPEAL IN 91-805. AJ PANEL SCDATE 090991 SCHPRD R
09/30/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091691 SCHPRD X
11/15/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 111191 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT ARE COMPLETE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992ORDER GR MO OF APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE COMP RECORD IS FILED. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 012292 SCHPRD V
05/13/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (44 pgs/tremel) proc. 1/10/89 in 91-cf805
05/14/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #11 (18 pgs. -- Swaringer) (11/28/88 proceedings).
05/14/1992RECORD COMPLETED
12/23/1992ORDER: The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By WHN)
02/18/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days
03/02/1993ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time, setting forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order may result in her appointment being vacated. (By RO)
04/07/1993ORDER - ORDERED that this court's order of March 2, 1993, is hereby vacated. F/O that appellant, shall within 15 days from the date of this order file his brief. (By RO)
04/23/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 1 week
05/03/1993RECEIVED aplt's brief (need motion to file excessive pages for brief)
05/03/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
05/03/1993APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGES
05/25/1993VOTE SHEET Appellant's motion for leave to file a brief exceeding the page limitation.
05/28/1993APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to July 1, 1993
06/03/1993ORD DENY APLT MO FOR LV TO FL BRF IN EXCESS OF PGS and appellant shall file a brief in conformance with rule 28(g) in 15 days. (By Fe-ST-PY)
06/03/1993ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days after the brief of appellant is filed with this court. (By FE-ST-PY)
06/22/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/22/1993RECEIVED - aplt's brief
07/22/1993RECEIVED Appellee's Brief.
07/30/1993CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
08/02/1993ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFand the lodged brief of appellant and appellee are filed.
08/02/1993APPELLANT'S BRIEF
08/02/1993APPELLEE'S BRIEF
08/02/1993BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/20/1993FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
12/09/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1993ARGUED (SC,WG,SU) BArbara E. Sosnick, Esquire, for appellant. Evan M. Corcoran, Esquire, for appellee.
11/04/1994AFFIRMED MOJ (WG,SC,SU)
11/16/1994APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to 30 days
11/28/1994ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB within 30 days from the date of this order. (WA)
12/28/1994APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
12/28/1994RECEIVED -aplt's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (need motion)
04/11/1995ORDER directing appellee within 20 days from the date of this order shall file a response to pet for reh/reh en banc (10 copies). (WA)
04/28/1995APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to petition for rehearing and suggestion for rehearing en banc.
06/14/1995LETTER -from aplt (Richards) re: attorney on appeal
06/20/1995LETTER referring to counsel for appellant a letter filed by appellant on June 14, 1995. (JAC)
08/16/1995ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (EB) (Former Associate Judge Sullivan was a member of the division that decided this case. After his departure from the court, Senior Judge Kern was selected by lot to consider the petition.)
08/16/1995APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Barbara E. Sosnick, Esq. (Petition for Writ of Certiorari)
08/24/1995MANDATE ISSUED
12/08/1995COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Denied