judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY WORTHINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0088
Short Caption:GREGORY WORTHINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5640-88Filed Date:01/17/1989

Opening Event Date:01/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory Worthington N
Vincent A. JankoskiYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WORTHINGTON, GREGORY UNITED STATES
01/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VINCENT A. JANKOSKI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FL DSA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD DSA
08/01/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD R
09/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (177 PGS RT - FRANKLIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/06/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD V
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BA
01/10/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UPON COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 010190 SCHPRD BE
01/17/1990RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM FRANKLIN - 7/6/88 PROCEEDING (CASE CONT. TO 8/26/88) JB PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD RT
01/30/1990ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD U
02/15/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT #3 (13 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050390 SCHPRD RT
06/26/1990ORDER DIR COUNSEL TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT IN APTMT BEING VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD V
07/03/1990ORDER SS, CRT'S ORD 6/26/90,DIRECTG CONS TO FL BA IN 10 IS VACATED F/O BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 080290 SCHPRD BE
01/09/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1991SUBMITTED PANELBEWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBEWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD