judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILTON E. CLINKSCALE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0089
Short Caption:MILTON E. CLINKSCALE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13044-88Filed Date:01/23/1989

Opening Event Date:01/23/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMilton E. Clinkscale N
Theodore O. Dix NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLINKSCALE, MILTON E. UNITED STATES
01/23/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THEODORE O. DIX, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD DSA
06/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (104 PGS/TROUPE -TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD R
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/30/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/30/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD V
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD BA
09/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
10/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD