judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC MELVIN COLLINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0169
Short Caption:ERIC MELVIN COLLINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6457-88Filed Date:02/17/1989

Opening Event Date:02/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/09/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Melvin Collins N
Geraldine H. OwensYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLLINS, ERIC MELVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/10/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - OWENSG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CORKENC FOR - APPELLEE
02/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD & STATE- MENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GERALDINE H. OWENS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 041889 SCHPRD R
07/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO PREPARE RT; RT DUE 7/31/89. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/24/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (49 PGS RT - MOORE) GT PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(11 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (336 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1989ORDER APLT BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRO SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD U
12/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD BA
12/20/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR A PERIOD OF 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 15 DAYS TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 6, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 012090 SCHPRD BA
02/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 2 DAYS TO FEBRUARY 8, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF WITH LIST RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT'S LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE WITHIN GW PANELRBH SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD V
04/16/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-16-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BE
05/10/1990ORDER GRNT APLE'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 051690. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD Q
05/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BE
10/09/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/09/1990ARGUED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1991REMANDED ORDER RM CASE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 596 A.2d 489
08/09/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 2117 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000
08/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD